GOVERNORS OF NEW SOUTH WALES SINCE 1788
1. Captain Arthur Phillip RN
7th Feb 1788 - 10 Dec 1792
2. Captain. John Hunter RN
11 Sept 1795 - 27 Sept 1800
3. Captain Phillip Gidley King
28 Sept 1800 - 12 Aug 1806
4. Captain William Bligh RN
13 Aug 1806 - 26 Jan 1808
5. Major General Lachlan Macquarie
1st. Jan 1810 - 1st Dec 1821
GOVERNORS UNDER KING GEORGE IV (1820 - 1830)
6. Major General Sir Thomas Brisbane BT, GCH, GCB
1st Dec 1821 - 1st Dec 1825
7. Luietenant General Sir Ralph Darling - GCH
19th Dec 1825 - 21st Oct 1831
GOVERNORS UNDER KING WILLIAM IV (1830 - 1837)
8. Major General. Sir. Richard Bourke - KCB
3rd Dec 1831 - 5th Deec 1837
GOVERNORS UNDER QUEEN VICTORIA (1837 - 1901)
9. Major Sir George Gipps
24th Feb 1838 - 11 July 1846
10. Lieutenant Colonel Sir Charles Augustus Fitzroy - KCB, KCB
3rd Aug 1846 - 28 Jan 1855
11. Sir William Denison - KCB
20 Jan 1855 - 22nd Jan 1861
12. The RT Hon. Sir John Young - BT, GCMG, KCB
16th May 1861 - 24 Dec 1867
13. The. RT Hon. The Earl Belmore - GCMG, PC
8th Jan 1868 - 2st Feb 1872
14. The RT Hon Sir Hercules Robinson - GCMG
3rd June 1872 - 19 March 1879
15. The RT Hon. Lord Augustus Loftus - GCB
4th Aug 1879 - 9th Nov 1885
16. The RT Hon. The Lord Carrington - GCMG, PC
12 Dec 1885- 3 Nov 1890
17. The RT Hon. EarlOf Jersey - GCB, GCMG, PC
15 Jan 1891 - 2 March 1893
18. The RT Hon Sir Robert Duff - GCMG
29thMay 1893 - 155th March 1895
19.The RT Hon The Viscount Hampden - GCMG
21 Nov 1895 - 5 March 1899
20. The RT Hon. The Earl Beauchamp - KG, KCMG, PC
18th May 18899 - 30th April 1901
GOVERNORS UNDER KING EDWARD VII (1901-1910)
21. Admiral Sir Harry Rawson - GCB, GCMG, RN
27 May 1902 - 27 May 1909
22. The RT Hon The Lord Chelmsford - GCMG
28 May 1909 - 11 March 1913
GOVERNORS UNDER KING GEORGE V (1910 - 1936)